Global Patent Index - EP 0828008 B1

EP 0828008 B1 2000-07-05 - Aluminium alloy with good machinability

Title (en)

Aluminium alloy with good machinability

Title (de)

Aluminiumlegierung mit guter Spanbarkeit

Title (fr)

Alliage d'aluminium avec une bonne usinabilité

Publication

EP 0828008 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810609 A

Priority

CZ 262896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828008A2] A machinable aluminium alloy, especially a free-machining AlCu or AlMgSi alloy, contains 0.2-1.2 wt.% Sn and 0.2-1.0 wt.% Bi as chip-breaking additives. Preferably, the alloy has the composition (by wt.): (a) 4.6-6.0% Cu, 0.2-1.0 (preferably 0.4-0.9, especially 0.6-0.8)% Bi, 0.2-0.7 (preferably 0.3-0.6, especially 0.4-0.6)% Sn, NOTGREATER 0.45% Zn, NOTGREATER 0.7% Fe, NOTGREATER 0.4% Si, NOTGREATER 0.05% each ( NOTGREATER 0.15% total) of other alloying elements and balance Al; or (b) 0.6-1.2% Mg, 0.6-1.4% Si, 0.6-1.2 (preferably 0.7-1.0, especially 0.7-0.9)% Sn, 0.2-0.7 (preferably 0.3-0.6, especially 0.4-0.6)% Bi, 0.2-0.6% Mn, NOTGREATER 0.5% Fe, NOTGREATER 5 (preferably 0.15-0.40)% Cu, NOTGREATER 0.2 (preferably 0.04-0.10)% Ti, NOTGREATER 0.05% each ( NOTGREATER 0.15% total) of other alloying elements and balance Al. Preferably, alloy (a) is produced by semi-continuous casting, high temperature annealing and extruding, followed by (i) solution annealing, quenching and artificial ageing to the maximum age-hardened state, resulting in a tensile strength of 370 MPa, a yield strength of 280 MPa, a hardness of 110 HB and an elongation at fracture (A5) of 10%; or (ii) solution annealing, quenching and artificial ageing to less than the maximum age-hardened state, resulting in a tensile strength of 270 MPa, a yield strength of 150 MPa, a hardness of 80 HB and an elongation at fracture (A5) of 20%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/12; C22C 21/02; C22C 21/04; C22C 21/14; C22C 21/16; C22F 1/05; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22C 21/12 (2006.01); C22C 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/08 (2013.01); C22C 21/003 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 21/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828008 A2 19980311; EP 0828008 A3 19981111; EP 0828008 B1 20000705; AT 194393 T 20000715; CZ 286150 B6 20000112; CZ 9602628 A3 19990512; DE 59701965 D1 20000810; EP 0982410 A1 20000301; HU 9701466 A2 19990628; HU 9701466 A3 20020328; HU 9701466 D0 19971128; PL 183835 B1 20020731; PL 321947 A1 19980316; SI 9700232 A 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20010323

2006-03-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20051115

2006-03-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20051115

2006-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-05-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM NV

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701965

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194393

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2000-02-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19990511

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990511

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI