Global Patent Index - EP 0828047 B1

EP 0828047 B1 2003-06-25 - Lock with latch

Title (en)

Lock with latch

Title (de)

Schloss mit Falle

Title (fr)

Serrure à pêne demi-tour

Publication

EP 0828047 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114580 A

Priority

DE 19636037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828047A2] The lock has a latch (F) which projects out through a latch aperture (16) of the sleeve (3) and can be withdrawn by operating the presser. There is a projection (31, 33) shaped for the long side of the latch aperture and projecting into a corresponding neck formation (30, 32) of the latch head (10). This projection may be on the opposite long side to the inclined plane of the latch. It may be arc-shaped and may project for roughly the width of the aperture edge region adjacent to the projections into the latch aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 59/00; E05B 17/20; E05B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/102 (2013.01); E05B 17/2003 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/127 (2013.01); E05B 63/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828047 A2 19980311; EP 0828047 A3 19980923; EP 0828047 B1 20030625; DE 19636037 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710332

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120817

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120807

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CARL FUHR GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710332 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CARL FUHR GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

1999-06-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE LI

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI