Global Patent Index - EP 0828069 A3

EP 0828069 A3 2000-02-23 - Method and apparatus for monitoring the flow restrictor of the fuel supply of an engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for monitoring the flow restrictor of the fuel supply of an engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung eines Durchflussbegrenzers eines Kraftstoffzumesssystems einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour surveiller le limiteur de débit de l'alimentation en carburant d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0828069 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97109450 A

Priority

DE 19632339 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828069A2] The monitoring method monitors the through flow limiters (180-183) arranged respectively between the fuel storage vessel (160) and each fuel injector (120-123) of a four cylinder IC engine (100) across a common fuel supply rail. Each limiter prevents a fuel flow to each cylinder, if the injected fuel amount exceeds a specific value. In determined operations for monitoring the through flow limiter, the injector is controlled in such a manner, that the injector releases an injected amount of fuel, which exceeds the specified limiting value. Then emanating from the reaction of the engine, is monitored whether the through flow limiter stops the flow of fuel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02D 2041/224 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632339 A1 19980212; CN 1085295 C 20020522; CN 1173585 A 19980218; EP 0828069 A2 19980311; EP 0828069 A3 20000223; JP H1077890 A 19980324

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI