Global Patent Index - EP 0828120 B1

EP 0828120 B1 2000-05-31 - Device for delivering metered quantities of ice cubes

Title (en)

Device for delivering metered quantities of ice cubes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abgeben dosierter Mengen von Kleineiskörpern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour délivrer des quantités dosées de glaçons

Publication

EP 0828120 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113126 A

Priority

EP 96113126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828120A1] The dispenser comprises a heat-insulated housing (10), a storage container (11) for undispensed ice cubes (36), a worm conveyor (12) and a dispensing aperture (19) for the ice cubes. The lower end (13) of the worm conveyor is located in the storage container and the upper end (14) of the worm conveyor has an outlet aperture (15) for the ice cubes. A channel-type slide (17) is positioned under the outlet aperture and has a dished electromagnetically operated flap (18) at the slide end. The slide leads to a weighing device (20), which has a weighing cell (21), a scale pan (23) with an openable base flap (24) and a suspension (22) that connects the scales bowl with the weighing cell. The flap has a horizontal axis and a fast-acting actuator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 5/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828120 A1 19980311; EP 0828120 B1 20000531; DE 59605362 D1 20000706; ES 2148643 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050817

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2004-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148643

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605362

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991118

1998-11-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

1998-11-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980518

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;SI