Global Patent Index - EP 0828133 B1

EP 0828133 B1 2001-12-12 - Light weight firearm receiver

Title (en)

Light weight firearm receiver

Title (de)

Handfeuerwaffe mit Leichtgehäuse

Title (fr)

Bâti à poids léger pour arme à feu

Publication

EP 0828133 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115495 A

Priority

AT 160096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828133A2] The housing forms a forward housing extension via a connection (14) with the barrel. A long rail is formed as support for the telescope on the top of the housing and on the housing extension. The housing parts are made of light metal, and are made from a drawn profile. The first part (10) is the housing and the second part (11) is the housing extension and the greatest part of the adhesive seam (13) between them is cylindrical. The cross-section of the housing or the housing extension over the horizontal central plane has a lateral widened formation on both sides and approximately forms a stage in it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 3/66; F41G 1/387

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 7/00 (2006.01); F41A 3/66 (2006.01); F41G 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 11/003 (2013.01); F41A 3/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828133 A2 19980311; EP 0828133 A3 19990120; EP 0828133 B1 20011212; AT 411296 B 20031125; AT A160096 A 20030415; CZ 295330 B6 20050713; CZ 9702510 A3 19980318; DE 59705745 D1 20020124; US 5881486 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705745

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, WIENER NEUSTADT, AT

- Document: DE 59705745

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705745

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2004-04-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-04-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-04-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705745 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991227

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI