Global Patent Index - EP 0828235 A3

EP 0828235 A3 2000-03-01 - Self-service shopping system including an electronic price label system

Title (en)

Self-service shopping system including an electronic price label system

Title (de)

System für Selbstbedienungsgeschäft mit einem elektronischen Preisschildsystem

Title (fr)

Système pour achats en libre-service incluant un système électronique d'étiquettes de prix

Publication

EP 0828235 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97303710 A

Priority

US 70902096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828235A2] A self-service shopping system which uses an electronic price label (EPL) (12) associated with an item to send a signal to a transaction processing system (25) to record the selection of that item by a customer. An item selector card (18) associated with a customer records item selected by passage through an item selector card reader (14) which is associated with an EPL (12). The transaction processing system (25) maintains a list of the selected items. Items may also be deselected. The item selector card (18) may have a bar code at each end, one bar code (22) recording selection and the other bar code (20) recording deselection of items. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/14; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/12 (2006.01); G07G 1/00 (2006.01); G07G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/0045 (2013.01); G07G 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0110085 A2 19840613 - BERKEL PATENT NV [NL]
  • [X] DE 4134872 A1 19930429 - BEDEY CHRISTIAN [DE]
  • [A] "COMPUTER-AUTOMATED SHOPPING", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 37, no. 3, March 1994 (1994-03-01), pages 269, XP000441469, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828235 A2 19980311; EP 0828235 A3 20000301; EP 0828235 B1 20020807; DE 69714529 D1 20020912; DE 69714529 T2 20030320; JP 4176172 B2 20081105; JP H10105832 A 19980424; US 5898383 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170529

2017-06-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170529

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-05-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20090416

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-08-19 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2005-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69714529 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/60 A, 7G 07G 1/14 B

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB