Global Patent Index - EP 0828265 B1

EP 0828265 B1 2002-11-13 - Current transformer and protective relay comprising such transformer

Title (en)

Current transformer and protective relay comprising such transformer

Title (de)

Stromwandler und Schutzrelais mit einem solchen Wandler

Title (fr)

Transformateur de courant et relais de protection comportant un tel transformateur

Publication

EP 0828265 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97410098 A

Priority

FR 9611041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828265A1] The current transformer has a primary and secondary winding wound on a common magnetic circuit (6). The windings are wound continuously on the magnetic circuit. The primary winding (5a) has a number (N1) of spiral windings wound in a first direction. The secondary winding follows on from the primary, but wound in the opposite direction with a smaller number (N2) of spiral windings. The transformer ratio is determined by the ratio fo the windings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828265 A1 19980311; EP 0828265 B1 20021113; DE 69717033 D1 20021219; DE 69717033 T2 20030710; ES 2184976 T3 20030416; FR 2752996 A1 19980306; FR 2752996 B1 19981002

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717033

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69717033

- Effective date: 20111228

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184976 T3

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717033 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1998-11-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1998-11-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980829

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT