Global Patent Index - EP 0828267 B1

EP 0828267 B1 2000-01-05 - Circuit breaker with forced opening

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with forced opening

Title (de)

Schutzschalter mit Zwangstrennung

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur avec commande d'ouverture positive

Publication

EP 0828267 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111531 A

Priority

DE 19632462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828267A2] The circuit-breaker has a number of contact pairs with the movable contact carrying arms supported on two pins Ä24Ü that allow pivoting of the carriers to take place when the switch is tripped. The pins are made of an insulating material with conducting metal inserts Ä21Ü that are normally in contact with the carriers. When the switch is tripped an electrically triggered charge Ä28Ü is activated to cause axial displacement of the pins and so break contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H01H 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/12 (2013.01); H01H 83/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632462 A1 19980219; DE 19632462 B4 20050504; AT 188573 T 20000115; EP 0828267 A2 19980311; EP 0828267 A3 19981223; EP 0828267 B1 20000105; ES 2143271 T3 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050709

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2004-07-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEINRICH KOPP A.G.

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010708

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-07-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000712

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-07-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000705

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143271 T3

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188573 T 20000115

1999-10-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990309

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI