Global Patent Index - EP 0828306 A3

EP 0828306 A3 2000-03-22 - A matched impedance filter

Title (en)

A matched impedance filter

Title (de)

Filter mit angepassten Impedanzen

Title (fr)

Filtre à impedance adapté

Publication

EP 0828306 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97306729 A

Priority

  • FI 963446 A
  • FI 963445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828306A2] In a radiofrequency filter (34; 35; 36) there is a port (34a; 34b; 34c) by means of which it is connected to an external component (14; 17; 21) and the impedance of which is adjusted by internal filter circuits so as to correspond to the impedance of the external component (Zant, ZRX, ZTX) at the operating frequency. The filter may for example be a duplex filter (34), in which case the internal impedance matching may be employed at the antenna port (34a), at the reception port (34b) and/or at the transmission port (34c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2136 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828306 A2 19980311; EP 0828306 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020803

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FILTRONIC LK OY

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB