Global Patent Index - EP 0828307 A3

EP 0828307 A3 2000-04-05 - RF-filtering solution for a radio transmitter/receiver

Title (en)

RF-filtering solution for a radio transmitter/receiver

Title (de)

HF-Filteranordnung für Funksender/Empfänger

Title (fr)

Arrangement de filtrage HF pour émetteur/récepteur radio

Publication

EP 0828307 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97306730 A

Priority

FI 963445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828307A2] In this radio set filtering solution, all passive filtering elements in the transmission and reception branch are combined as an integrated filtering unit (25). The active radiofrequency components (11, 14, 17, 30) are connected to the ports of the filtering unit directly without separate impedance matching networks, since the impedance of the ports is adjusted so that it is correct for the internal connections of the filtering unit. The filtering unit may contain a duplex filter (25a, 25b), in which case it is connected directly to the antenna (21). Also, by adjustment of the antenna port, a separate antenna-impedance matching network inside the filtering unit is avoided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2136 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828307 A2 19980311; EP 0828307 A3 20000405; FI 110968 B 20030430; FI 963445 A0 19960903; FI 963445 A 19980304

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040323

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FILTRONIC LK OY

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB