Global Patent Index - EP 0828309 A3

EP 0828309 A3 2000-04-19 - Method of fabricating electrical components

Title (en)

Method of fabricating electrical components

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von elektrischen Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de composants électriques

Publication

EP 0828309 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115137 A

Priority

DE 19635956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0828309A2] The method involves fabricating a device which has a plastic body that is produced from a dielectric material. This is done by either a moulding, extrusion or pressing process. A metal coating layer Ä2Ü, with the required form for the emitter, is formed on the surface of the plastic. The metal coating is arranged to have a waveguide shape. The external dimensions of the plastic body conform with the internal dimensions of the metallised regions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 11/00; H01Q 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 11/00 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 11/00 (2013.01); H01Q 21/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0828309 A2 19980311; EP 0828309 A3 20000419; DE 19635956 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-02-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE