Global Patent Index - EP 0828602 B1

EP 0828602 B1 2000-04-12 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT STRUCTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ABSORBIERENDEN STRUCTUREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE ABSORBANTE

Publication

EP 0828602 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919437 A

Priority

  • FR 9700562 W
  • FR 9603779 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735712A1] A method for making an absorbent structure (10) having at least two plies (P1, P2) each consisting of at least one embossed absorbent crepe paper sheet, wherein the plies (P1, P2) are fed between two synchronously rotated and mutually overlapping grooved metal cylinders (CG1, CG2) provided with projections (R1, R2), in such a way that the clearance (J) between the tops of the projections (R1, R2) of one metal cylinder (CG1, CG2) and the facing bottom surface (F2, F1) of a groove in the other cylinder (CG2, CG1) is smaller than the groove depth of the cylinders and larger than the sum of the thicknesses (E1, E2) of the previously formed plies (P1, P2), whereby said plies (P1, P2) are not compressed as they are fed between the overlapping grooved cylinders (CG1, CG2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0743 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0758 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0764 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0774 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1025 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24562 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24669 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735712 A1 19971002; AT 191677 T 20000415; DE 69701661 D1 20000518; DE 69701661 T2 20000831; DK 0828602 T3 20000717; EP 0828602 A1 19980318; EP 0828602 B1 20000412; ES 2145599 T3 20000701; FR 2746702 A1 19971003; FR 2746702 B1 19980529; GR 3033905 T3 20001130; PT 828602 E 20000929; TR 9701442 T1 19980622; US 6306482 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FORT JAMES FRANCE

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060328

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-09-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-03-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050301

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-07-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145599 T3

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701661 20000518

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191677 T 20000415

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980911

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980402

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE