Global Patent Index - EP 0828752 A4

EP 0828752 A4 2000-07-26 - CHITOTRIOSIDASE

Title (en)

CHITOTRIOSIDASE

Title (de)

CHITOTRIOSIDASE

Title (fr)

CHITOTRIOSIDASE

Publication

EP 0828752 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917674 A

Priority

  • US 9705072 W
  • US 1429596 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736917A1] Nucleic acid sequences for chitotriosidase are provided. Methods of detecting altered expression of tissue remodeling proteins and diagnosing tissue remodeling disorders are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C12N 9/14; C12N 9/24; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 9/24 (2006.01); C12N 9/36 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Y 302/01014 (2013.01); C12N 9/2442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] BOOT R G ET AL: "CLONING OF A CDNA ENCODING CHITOTRIOSIDASE, A HUMAN CHITINASE PRODUCED BY MACROPHAGES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, vol. 270, no. 44, 3 November 1995 (1995-11-03), pages 26252 - 26256, XP002039025, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] J.A.FUHRMAN ET AL.: "Transmission-blcking Antibodies Recognize Microfilarial Chitinase in Brugian Lymphatic Filariasis.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., vol. 89, no. 5, 1 March 1992 (1992-03-01), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, pages 1548 - 1552, XP002138198, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 9736917A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736917 A1 19971009; AU 2593797 A 19971022; EP 0828752 A1 19980318; EP 0828752 A4 20000726; JP H11508139 A 19990721; ZA 9702691 B 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980409

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL