Global Patent Index - EP 0828876 B1

EP 0828876 B1 2000-05-24 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING A WEFT THREAD INTO A SHED COURSE LOOM

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING A WEFT THREAD INTO A SHED COURSE LOOM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUSSFADENEINTRAG IN EINE REIHENFACHWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'INSERER UN FIL DE TRAME DANS UN METIER A TISSER A OUVERTURE DES FILS EN SERIE

Publication

EP 0828876 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909001 A

Priority

  • CH 9600158 W
  • CH 163795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9638609A1] The invention relates to a process for producing a fabric by means of a shed course loom having a weaving rotor (6), in which there are at least two spaced shed-forming sections (6a, 6b) on the weaving rotor and the sections (6a, 6b) are supplied with separate weft threads (2a, 3a) supplied only to one section (6a; 6b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 33/00; D03D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 33/00 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/005 (2013.01); D03D 33/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9638609 A1 19961205; AU 5268096 A 19961218; DE 59605311 D1 20000629; EP 0828876 A1 19980318; EP 0828876 B1 20000524; JP H11505895 A 19990525; US 5904186 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050426

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605311 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT