Global Patent Index - EP 0828889 B9

EP 0828889 B9 2001-03-14 - USE OF AGENTS FOR CELLULOSE AND PAPER PRODUCTION

Title (en)

USE OF AGENTS FOR CELLULOSE AND PAPER PRODUCTION

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON MITTELN ZUR ZELLSTOFF- UND PAPIERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'AGENTS POUR PRODUIRE DE LA CELLULOSE OU DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 0828889 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 96916148 A

Priority

  • DE 19519268 A
  • EP 9602191 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9638628A1] The invention relates to the use of oil-in-water emulsions for cleaning machines and plant components in the production of cellulose, paper, paperboard and cardboard and to prevent the pollution of such units by adhesives and adherent resins. As components of the oil phase, the emulsions contains at least one of the following materials: (1) a saturated or unsaturated, open-chained or cyclic, normal or isomeric hydrocarbon with 8 to 30 carbon atoms; (2) a saturated or unsaturated fatty alcohol, a saturated or unsaturated fatty acid, a fatty acid monoalkyl ester, a fatty acid amide or a fatty acid monoalkyl amide of a saturated or unsaturated fatty acid, with all these compounds having 8 to 30 carbon atoms; (3) a mono or polyester of a saturated or unsaturated mono or polyvalent carboxylic acid with 2 to 30 carbon atoms and polyols except for polyethylene glycols; (4) a polyamide of saturated or unsaturated fatty acids with 8 to 30 carbon atoms and aliphatic polyamines with two to six nitrogen atoms; (5) an acyclic preferably monocyclic and/or bicyclic terpene, especially a terpene hydrocarbon, and/or a terpene alcohol, and/or (6) a polyoxyalkylene compound based on alkylene oxides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/30; D21F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/30 (2006.01); D21F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/30 (2013.01); D21F 1/32 (2013.01); Y10S 162/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9638628 A1 19961205; AT 183563 T 19990915; AU 5900996 A 19961218; AU 702067 B2 19990211; CA 2219068 A1 19961205; CA 2219068 C 20030708; CO 4560397 A1 19980210; CZ 294869 B6 20050413; CZ 9703670 A3 19980218; DE 19519268 C1 19970123; DK 0828889 T3 20000306; DK 0828889 T5 20000821; EP 0828889 A1 19980318; EP 0828889 B1 19990818; EP 0828889 B9 20010314; ES 2137696 T3 19991216; HU 9802173 A2 19981228; HU 9802173 A3 20020828; MA 23885 A1 19961231; MX 9708879 A 19980630; NO 309989 B1 20010430; NO 975431 A 19971126; NO 975431 D0 19971126; PE 6197 A1 19970419; PL 181946 B1 20011031; PL 323637 A1 19980414; SK 160597 A3 19980909; SK 284745 B6 20051103; TW 438930 B 20010607; US 5863385 A 19990126; ZA 9603996 B 19961127

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080522

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ASHLAND LICENSING AND INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-06-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ASHLAND LICENSING AND INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC

- Effective date: 20071022

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2007-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC

- Free text: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ASHLAND LICENSING & INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC#5200 BLAZER PARKWAY#DUBLIN, OH 43017 (US)

2007-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH

- Free text: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STOCKHAUSEN GMBH#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE)

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-07 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-01-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH

2004-12-31 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-08-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH

- Free text: STOCKHAUSEN GMBH & CO. KG#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STOCKHAUSEN GMBH#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-09-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2000-08-21 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-06-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-05-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-03-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19991110

1999-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2137696 T3

1999-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1999-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19991020

1999-11-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

1999-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59602807 19990923

1999-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980130

1999-08-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990818

1999-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 183563 T 19990915

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990202

1998-07-08 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 980130

1998-05-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 971210

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971210

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE