Global Patent Index - EP 0828937 B1

EP 0828937 B1 2001-12-05 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0828937 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945475 A

Priority

  • DE 9601870 W
  • DE 19608608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19608608A1] A fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines has a fuel feeding channel which opens into an injection opening and in which is mounted a rod-shaped filtering body (39) upstream of the injection opening. The filtering body (39) has at each of its front ends a collar (43, 45) with an increased diameter in relation to a medium section (41) of the filtering body (39). Two groups of longitudinal grooves closed on one side in the axial direction are worked into the outer surface of the filtering body (39). A first group (47) starts from a top front face (49) of the filtering body (39) away from the injection opening (17) and a second group (51) starts from a bottom front face (53) of the filtering body (39) towards the injection opening (17). The longitudinal grooves of the first and second groups (47, 51) alternate around the circumference of the filtering body (39). In order to reliably prevent the penetration of soil particles, the bottom collar (45) extends beyond the axial closed end of the longitudinal grooves of the first group (47).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; B01D 29/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); B01D 29/44 (2006.01); B01D 35/027 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19608608 A1 19970911; DE 59608380 D1 20020117; EP 0828937 A1 19980318; EP 0828937 B1 20011205; JP 3737125 B2 20060118; JP H11505586 A 19990521; KR 100430173 B1 20040804; US 5996908 A 19991207; WO 9733085 A1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608380

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140930

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608380 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991115

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT