Global patent index - EP 0828942 B1

EP 0828942 B1 2000-08-09 - HYDROPNEUMATIC MACHINE TOOL

Title (en)

HYDROPNEUMATIC MACHINE TOOL

Title (de)

HYDROPNEUMATISCHE WERKZEUGMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL HYDROPNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 0828942 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920528 A

Priority

  • DE 9700559 W
  • DE 19610726 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735114A1] A machine tool is proposed which operates with a hydropneumatic pressure intensifier whose step piston (1) is braked hydraulically in particular towards the end of its stroke by forcing hydraulic fluid from a braking cavity (35) formed during the stroke via a choke point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/032; B30B 15/16; F15B 11/072; F15B 11/076; F15B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/16 (2006.01); F15B 11/032 (2006.01); F15B 11/076 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/161 (2013.01); F15B 11/0325 (2013.01); F15B 11/076 (2013.01); F15B 2211/216 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/775 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735114 A1 19970925; DE 19780220 D2 19980319; EP 0828942 A1 19980318; EP 0828942 B1 20000809; US 5943862 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160303

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702132

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702132

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ,

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110319

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090310

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702132

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991207

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971112

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT