Global Patent Index - EP 0828945 B1

EP 0828945 B1 2002-09-11 - PILOT CONTROLLED SERVO-VALVE

Title (en)

PILOT CONTROLLED SERVO-VALVE

Title (de)

VORGESTEUERTES SERVOVENTIL

Title (fr)

SERVO-SOUPAPE A COMMANDE PILOTE

Publication

EP 0828945 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95937068 A

Priority

  • EP 9504454 W
  • LU 88558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9615373A1] A pilot controlled servo-valve has four main flow connections (20, 22, 24, 26), an axially sliding main control piston (18) with four control edges (28', 30', 32', 34') and a front restoring spring (78) that defines a spring-centred middle position of the main control piston (18). A control sleeve (12) has ring-shaped openings (20', 22', 24') for the first, second and third main flow connections (20, 22, 24) and a front opening (26') for the fourth main flow connection (26). A first front face of the main control piston (18) is axially opposed to said opening (26'). A pressure compensating surface (60) is formed by the second front face of the main control piston (18)in a spring chamber (52). The main control piston (18) applies the pressure in the fourth main flow connection on said pressure compensating surface (60) through a pressure relief channel (44). A transverse bore (46) connects said pressure relief channel to an auxiliary connection chamber (36) connected to the third main flow connection (24) by the fourth control edge (34'). This valve may be space-savingly integrated in a hydraulic block and has a clearly defined middle position, as well as a remarkable dynamic performance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F16K 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86606 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86614 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9615373 A1 19960523; AT 224012 T 20020915; AU 3928595 A 19960606; CA 2205441 A1 19960523; CA 2205441 C 20050208; CN 1070584 C 20010905; CN 1163657 A 19971029; DE 59510375 D1 20021017; EP 0828945 A1 19980318; EP 0828945 B1 20020911; JP 3638286 B2 20050413; JP H10508679 A 19980825; LU 88558 A1 19960715; RU 2153105 C2 20000720; US 5896890 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59510375

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59510375

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510375 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224012 T 20020915

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

1998-04-08 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970408

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL