Global Patent Index - EP 0828973 B1

EP 0828973 B1 2000-03-08 - FIREPLACE WITH HEAT-ACCUMULATING WALLS, COMPOSED OF SEPARATE, PREFABRICATED MODULE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

FIREPLACE WITH HEAT-ACCUMULATING WALLS, COMPOSED OF SEPARATE, PREFABRICATED MODULE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

OFFENER KAMIN MIT WÄRMESPEICHERNDEN WÄNDEN ZUSAMMENGESTELLT AUS MEHREREN VORGEFERTIGTEN MODULEN

Title (fr)

ATRE A PAROIS A ACCUMULATION DE CHALEUR FAITE D'ELEMENTS MODULAIRES DISTINCTS ET PREFABRIQUES

Publication

EP 0828973 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95941317 A

Priority

  • SE 9501497 W
  • SE 9404381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618854A1] A fireplace with heat-accumulating walls (2, 3, 4, 5) comprising a combustion chamber (10) and a flue gas space (14) being dismountably composed of separate, prefabricated module elements for walls (2, 3, 4, 5), top (7) and bottom (1), the wall elements (2, 3, 4, 5) consisting of an outer plate cover (28) formed as a mould, heat-accumulating material (29) being moulded therein and having assembly means (32) at its edge areas for dismountable mounting of the wall elements (2, 3, 4, 5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618854 A1 19960620; DE 69515526 D1 20000413; DE 69515526 T2 20001116; DK 0828973 T3 20000731; EP 0828973 A1 19980318; EP 0828973 B1 20000308; FI 104853 B 20000414; FI 972531 A0 19970613; FI 972531 A 19970613; NO 306881 B1 20000103; NO 972752 A 19970813; NO 972752 D0 19970613; SE 503910 C2 19960930; SE 9404381 D0 19941215; SE 9404381 L 19960616

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-16 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-03-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-08-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515526

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2000-03-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980831

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970704

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB