Global patent index - EP 0829018 B1

EP 0829018 B1 2000-02-02 - MAGNETIZING ARRANGEMENT FOR A MAGNETO-RESISTIVE THIN-FILM SENSOR ELEMENT WITH A BIAS LAYER PART

Title (en)

MAGNETIZING ARRANGEMENT FOR A MAGNETO-RESISTIVE THIN-FILM SENSOR ELEMENT WITH A BIAS LAYER PART

Title (de)

MAGNETISIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MAGNETORESISTIVES DÜNNSCHICHT-SENSORELEMENT MIT EINEM BIASSCHICHTTEIL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MAGNETISATION POUR ELEMENT DE DETECTION A COUCHE MINCE MAGNETORESISTIVE COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE DE COUCHE DE POLARISATION

Publication

EP 0829018 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96915956 A

Priority

  • DE 9600961 W
  • DE 19520172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19520172A1] The invention concerns an arrangement (7) for setting the magnetization distribution of the bias layer part (3) of a sensor element (E). This element has a thin-film structure (S) on a substrate (2) and displays an increased magneto-resistive effect. According to the invention, the arrangement (7) comprises an electrically conductive printed conductor part (L) and means for positioning this printed conductor part (L) relative to the sensor element (E). In this way, a pre-determined set current (Ie) can be guided via the printed conductor part (L) such that the pre-determined magnetization distribution can be set in a fixed manner in the bias layer part (3) of the sensor element (E).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 33/09; H01F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/09 (2006.01); H01F 13/00 (2006.01); H01L 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 25/00 (2013.01); G01R 33/093 (2013.01); H01F 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4470031 A 19840904 - STEINGROEVER ERICH [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19520172 A1 19961205; EP 0829018 A1 19980318; EP 0829018 B1 20000202; JP H11505931 A 19990525; US 6031372 A 20000229; WO 9638738 A1 19961205

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604374

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604374

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604374

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980623

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971120

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT