Global Patent Index - EP 0829073 B1

EP 0829073 B1 2000-10-11 - SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM

Title (en)

SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM

Title (de)

ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE

Publication

EP 0829073 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96919952 A

Priority

  • GB 9601307 W
  • GB 9511144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9638828A1] An optical surveillance system for use, e.g. in detecting shoplifting in retail outlets is disclosed, in which a surveillance assembly provided with an optical detector (such as a closed circuit television camera) is mounted on a rail, permitting the optical detector to be selectively positioned, for example to reduce blind spots due to obstacles. The rail may, for example, be ceiling mounted, or may form part of furniture, freezer cabinets, etc. Image signals from the optical detector are carried by at least one electrical conductor along the rail and the system may have provision for transmission of control signals along the rail to the surveillance assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19632 (2013.01); G08B 13/19619 (2013.01); G08B 13/19623 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9638828 A1 19961205; AU 5841496 A 19961218; DE 69610624 D1 20001116; EP 0829073 A1 19980318; EP 0829073 B1 20001011; GB 9511144 D0 19950726

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-06-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610624 20001116

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2000-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971229

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT