Global Patent Index - EP 0829301 B1

EP 0829301 B1 2001-05-30 - Machine having two rollers and method for pressure treatment of granular material

Title (en)

Machine having two rollers and method for pressure treatment of granular material

Title (de)

Zweiwalzenmaschine und Verfahren zur Druckbehandlung körnigen Gutes

Title (fr)

Machine à deux rouleaux et procédé pour le traitement en pression de matière granulaire

Publication

EP 0829301 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111955 A

Priority

DE 19632976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829301A1] The two-roll machine (10), such as a high-pressure roll press has a gap (20) between its rolls. There is a sieve device (16) in the issuing shaft (15) to sift the grain material, with a sieve overflow (18). A crushing roll (14) is also fitted in the shaft. The sieve gap width is from less than one to two and a half times the roll gap. The crushing roll forms a gap (19) with the main roll. The sieve device may consist of a vibrating sieve, a sieve trough or a static sieve grille.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/28; B02C 4/02; B02C 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/02 (2006.01); B02C 4/28 (2006.01); B02C 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/02 (2013.01); B02C 4/286 (2013.01); B02C 23/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632976 A1 19980219; DK 0829301 T3 20010806; EP 0829301 A1 19980318; EP 0829301 B1 20010530; US 5876648 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-06-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020704

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703657 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK