Global Patent Index - EP 0829303 B1

EP 0829303 B1 2001-12-12 - Ring roller mill for pressure milling of granular material

Title (en)

Ring roller mill for pressure milling of granular material

Title (de)

Ringwalzenmühle zur Druckzerkleinerung körnigen Gutmaterials

Title (fr)

Broyeur à anneau et rouleau pour le broyage par pression de matériau granulé

Publication

EP 0829303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97114172 A

Priority

DE 19637274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829303A1] The mill has a rotary grinding ring (10) whose cylindrical inside surface forms a grinding track (14), against which a drum (13) is pressed. An inlet and outlet are provided for the material, together with a gas inlet and exhaust. The grille (29) of a sieve-cage is mounted inside the ring and between the track and the drum. The ring can be mounted between end walls (15,16) forming a housing in conjunction with it. Material flows in via one or more openings (18) in one or both walls, and out via others and/or lateral bends (19) above the drum. The bearings for the latter can be outside the walls, and scrapers can be fixed to the latter, bearing against the track (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 15/06; B02C 23/16; B02C 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/06 (2006.01); B02C 23/16 (2006.01); B02C 23/32 (2006.01); B02C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/06 (2013.01); B02C 23/16 (2013.01); B02C 23/32 (2013.01); B02C 2015/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829303 A1 19980318; EP 0829303 B1 20011212; DE 19637274 A1 19980319; DK 0829303 T3 20020408

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705747 20020124

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000615

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

1998-03-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI