Global Patent Index - EP 0829309 A3

EP 0829309 A3 2000-11-22 - Ultrasound generating method for non-destructive testing and test apparatus

Title (en)

Ultrasound generating method for non-destructive testing and test apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Ultraschallwellen zur zerstörungsfreien Werkstoff-prüfung und Prüfvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de génération d'ultrason pour contrôle non-destructif et dispositif de contrôle

Publication

EP 0829309 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115124 A

Priority

DE 19637424 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829309A2] The method uses a tester (2) which generates the ultrasound waves (4) when applied to the material (24) under test. The four HF coils (12,14,16,18) are arranged in an essentially homogeneous magnetic field (26) produced by the three permanent magnets (6,8,10). The waves are generated due to the interaction between the eddy currents produced by the coils and the homogeneous magnetic field produced by the magnets, at right angles to the surface. The coils are arranged between the magnets. The irradiation angle alpha is dependent only on the delay time DELTA t of the drive between neighbouring coils.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829309 A2 19980318; EP 0829309 A3 20001122; DE 19637424 A1 19980326; US 5936162 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE SE

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE SE