Global Patent Index - EP 0829315 B1

EP 0829315 B1 2001-12-05 - Device for water cooling rolled sections

Title (en)

Device for water cooling rolled sections

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Wasserkühlung von profiliertem Walzgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidissement par eau de produits laminés profilés

Publication

EP 0829315 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115238 A

Priority

DE 19637583 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829315A1] The apparatus is intended for water-cooling of the flanges of rolled profiles, in particular, rolled beams lying on a roller conveyor. It is characterised by arrays of spray nozzles (5) which are arranged on both sides of the conveyor, at a distance above the profile transport, and are adjustable in orientation in a vertical plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 45/02; C21D 1/667; C21D 9/00; B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/14 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 45/0215 (2013.01); B21B 45/0233 (2013.01); C21D 1/667 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01); B05B 15/652 (2018.02); B21B 1/08 (2013.01); B21B 39/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829315 A1 19980318; EP 0829315 B1 20011205; AT 209977 T 20011215; DE 19637583 A1 19980319; JP 4231562 B2 20090304; JP H1085824 A 19980407; US 6003330 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170902

2017-09-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170902

2017-09-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705640

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59705640

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705640

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-09-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2003-09-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705640 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209977 T 20011215

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT SE

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970918

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE