Global patent index - EP 0829437 B1

EP 0829437 B1 2000-01-26 - Arrangement and support for a side-pull-device

Title (en)

Arrangement and support for a side-pull-device

Title (de)

Anordnung und Lagerung einer Seitenziehvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Agencement et support d'un dispositif pour le déplacement latéral

Publication

EP 0829437 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118475 A

Priority

  • DE 4437008 A
  • DE 19525185 A
  • EP 95114504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829437A2] The housing (16) of the mechanism (3) contains bearings and guide members (13). They are held by a spring (26) in guides (7,12). The housing is movable at right angles to the table (1). Rollers, or alternatively a supporting arm, can form the bearings and members, and the spring can be of the leaf type, supporting a roller running against a fixed supporting surface (8) on the frame. The guides can consist of grooves formed in cross-members (4,6) on the table. The cross-members can form a one-piece housing in conjunction with sidewalls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19525185 A1 19960418; DE 19525185 C2 19991014; EP 0829437 A2 19980318; EP 0829437 A3 19980415; EP 0829437 B1 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507716

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121102

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050915

2004-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030915

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2002-09-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507716

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 708045

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990212

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-03-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 708045

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL