Global Patent Index - EP 0829450 B1

EP 0829450 B1 2000-01-05 - Method for cleaning a filling machine with a CIP device and filling machine

Title (en)

Method for cleaning a filling machine with a CIP device and filling machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur CIP-Reinigung einer Füllmaschine sowie Füllmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de nettoyage d'une machine de remplissage au moyen d'une installation CIP ainsi que machine de remplissage

Publication

EP 0829450 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110963 A

Priority

DE 19636805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829450A1] The cleaning method requires feeding at least one cleaning medium through the gas and liquid flow paths within the filling machine under control of at least one electrical control (28,29,30), with the carousel for the filled containers held stationary. The controlled valves (20,23,24) for the filling element (4) within the container filling machine are opened and closed by the electrical control during the cleaning cycle using a stored control programme.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829450 A1 19980318; EP 0829450 B1 20000105; DE 19636805 A1 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20111114

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59700956

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

1998-12-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980414

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL