Global patent index - EP 0829575 B1

EP 0829575 B1 2001-03-14 - Process and device for direct or indirect application of liquid or pasty media on a running material web

Title (en)

Process and device for direct or indirect application of liquid or pasty media on a running material web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Mediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'application directe ou indirecte d'un médium liquide ou pasteux sur une bande de matérial mouvante

Publication

EP 0829575 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111574 A

Priority

DE 19637164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829575A1] In a process for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or paste-form medium to a moving web of material, especially paper or paperboard, the medium (10) is applied directly to the surface of the web, which is supported on a backing surface (12) or, in an indirect coating process, to the surface (33) of a rotating roll which then applies the medium to the web as it passes through a coating gap. The cross-machine profile of the coating medium is controllably varied during application, whilst the profile in the direction of web travel is controllably varied immediately after application. The control of the cross-machine and longitudinal coating medium profiles is carried out by separate control loops (21,22,23,20; 21,23,26,29,17c) using measurements (21,22) of the profile of the coating medium on the web material or on the applicator roll. The measured values (23a,23b) of the coating profiles are compared using a computer with set-point values (24,27), and deviations are convert ed into corresponding , separate instructions (25,28) to influence (16,17c) the cross-machine and longitudinal profiles respectively. Also claimed is an arrangement for the control procedure on a coating system in which the coater (15) is divided into independently controlled zones across the machine width with an equaliser (17) and a means (17c,29,30) for adjusting the entire width of the coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/04 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01); D21H 23/78 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0283 (2013.01); B05C 11/025 (2013.01); D21H 23/78 (2013.01); D21H 23/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829575 A1 19980318; EP 0829575 B1 20010314; AT 199753 T 20010315; DE 19637164 A1 19980319; JP H1085649 A 19980407; US 6010739 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703130

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120709

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110710

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120709

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 199753

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120709

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703130

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199753

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991220

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980918

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1998-03-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI