Global Patent Index - EP 0829604 A3

EP 0829604 A3 2000-02-09 - Espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Treibstangenverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure à crémone

Publication

EP 0829604 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114577 A

Priority

DE 19637263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829604A2] The shutter (1) has a central lock (3) and a main locking bar (6), with the driving rod (8) arranged so as to extend from the central lock and activate a secondary lock (9) which has a locking bolt (22). The actuation of the locking bolt is coupled to the movement of the driving rod and the secondary lock is formed as a yoke lock. The locking bolt is shiftable to a catch position when actuated manually to be disengaged from the driving rod movement. The actuation of the locking bolt can be coupled to the backward movement of the driving rod for pulling back the bolt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05C 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/166 (2013.01); E05C 9/1841 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 3503466 A1 19860807 - GRUNDMANN ROHRBACHER SCHLOSSER [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829604 A2 19980318; EP 0829604 A3 20000209; DE 19637263 A1 19980326; DE 19637263 B4 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-11-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI