Global Patent Index - EP 0829609 B1

EP 0829609 B1 2001-05-09 - Heat-insulating compound profile for doors, windows or facades

Title (en)

Heat-insulating compound profile for doors, windows or facades

Title (de)

Wärmegedämmtes Verbundprofil für Türen, Fenster oder Fassaden

Title (fr)

Profilé composite calorifuge pour portes, fenêtres ou façades

Publication

EP 0829609 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112230 A

Priority

DE 19637858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6035600A] A heat-insulated composite section for doors, windows and facades, includes a plurality of metal rail sections so connected as to form a frame, at least one insulating rod arranged between the rail sections and having longitudinal edges secured to the metal sections, and a compensation structure provided in a longitudinal connection zone between interconnected components for eliminating a flexure of the rail sections when subject to uneven temperature rise. The compensation structure effects a slight resistance to longitudinal displacement, or resistance to longitudinal displacement that approaches zero, or is formed by a sliding-type guidance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/18 (2006.01); E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 3/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26305 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26314 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26316 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26365 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26376 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6035600 A 20000314; AT 201083 T 20010515; BA 97255 A 20001106; BG 101871 A 19980731; BG 62821 B1 20000831; CA 2215591 A1 19980317; CA 2215591 C 20051101; CN 1177052 A 19980325; CN 1312373 C 20070425; CZ 293569 B6 20040616; CZ 9702893 A3 19980415; DE 19637858 A1 19980402; DE 29623019 U1 19970828; DK 0829609 T3 20010806; EE 03532 B1 20011015; EE 9700171 A 19980415; EP 0829609 A2 19980318; EP 0829609 A3 19981118; EP 0829609 B1 20010509; ES 2156323 T3 20010616; GR 3036194 T3 20011031; HR P970500 A2 19980630; HR P970500 B1 20020430; HU 221520 B 20021128; HU 9701473 A2 19980528; HU 9701473 A3 19981028; HU 9701473 D0 19971028; JP 4155610 B2 20080924; JP H10102920 A 19980421; NO 319731 B1 20050912; NO 974272 A 19980318; NO 974272 D0 19970916; PT 829609 E 20010928; RS 49917 B 20080929; RU 2183243 C2 20020610; SK 123697 A3 19980408; SK 285095 B6 20060601; TR 9700820 A2 19980421; TW 357222 B 19990501; YU 38097 A 19991227

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170716

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2017-07-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59703498

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150718

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150717

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201083 T

- Effective date: 20150717

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140718

2015-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150317

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140717

2015-04-06 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20010401042

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150119

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090717

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090717

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-02-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090717

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156323 T3

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703498 20010613

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970717;LV PAYMENT 19970717;RO PAYMENT 19970717;SI PAYMENT 19970717

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201083 T 20010515

1999-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970717;LV PAYMENT 19970717;RO PAYMENT 19970717;SI PAYMENT 19970717

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 970717;LV PAYMENT 970717;RO PAYMENT 970717;SI PAYMENT 970717

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970717

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-03-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 970717;LV PAYMENT 970717;RO PAYMENT 970717;SI PAYMENT 970717