EP 0829680 A3 19981216 - Device for feeding coffins to a crematory incinerator
Title (en)
Device for feeding coffins to a crematory incinerator
Title (de)
Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Särgen zu einem Einäscherungsofen eines Krematoriums
Title (fr)
Dispositif permettant d'amener des cercueils dans un four crématoire
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19637143 A 19960912
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0829680A2] The transfer trolley (10) holds the coffin (27) in a closed container. The loaded container is moved to the door of the crematorium oven and is coupled to it. The oven and trolley doors are opened enabling the coffin to be transferred into the oven without loss of fumes and without undue cooling of the oven. The trolley is self propelled and is used to collect coffins from the cold storage to transfer to the oven. The battery driven trolley is recharged when the trolley is coupled to the oven. The coffin is moved in and out of the trolley on a sliding support frame, which can be inclined.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F23G 1/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F23G 1/00 (2013.01); F23G 2205/18 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 2903199 A1 19800731 - FROELING SIEGOFA ABFALLTECH
- [Y] DD 271557 A1 19890906 - FUERSTENBERG VEB MASCHBAU [DD]
- [E] DE 19628741 A1 19980122 - SBW SONDERABFALLENTSORGUNG BAD [DE]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 134 (M - 479) 17 May 1986 (1986-05-17)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 064 (M - 285) 27 March 1984 (1984-03-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 212 (M - 710) 17 June 1988 (1988-06-17)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0829680 A2 19980318; EP 0829680 A3 19981216; DE 19637143 A1 19980319
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 97115906 A 19970912; DE 19637143 A 19960912