Global Patent Index - EP 0829890 B1

EP 0829890 B1 2002-11-13 - Multi-pole electric switch with a switch shaft per pole

Title (en)

Multi-pole electric switch with a switch shaft per pole

Title (de)

Mehrphasiger elektrischer Schalter mit einer Schaltwelle je Phase

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique multipolaire ayant un barreau de commutation élémentaire par pôle

Publication

EP 0829890 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97410099 A

Priority

FR 9611456 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829890A1] The modular assembly method involves using a number of individual contact units (42) corresponding to the number of poles to be switched. The units are housed in an outer housing. Each unit is held in a casing, allowing it to rotate, and has protruding arms. These contact arms can make or break contact with static contact pads. A rod common to all units, passes along the housing length, and is connected to each unit. As the rod moves, so all the units are rotated and switch together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00; H01H 19/64; H01H 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 19/64 (2006.01); H01H 21/18 (2006.01); H01H 1/36 (2006.01); H01H 3/40 (2006.01); H01H 21/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/18 (2013.01); H01H 9/0072 (2013.01); H01H 19/64 (2013.01); H01H 1/2041 (2013.01); H01H 1/365 (2013.01); H01H 3/40 (2013.01); H01H 21/42 (2013.01); H01H 2071/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829890 A1 19980318; EP 0829890 B1 20021113; CN 1180914 A 19980506; CN 1198303 C 20050420; DE 69717035 D1 20021219; DE 69717035 T2 20030710; EA 000359 B1 19990624; EA 199700180 A1 19980430; ES 2184977 T3 20030416; FR 2753563 A1 19980320; FR 2753563 B1 19981016; US 5886311 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717035

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140906

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140905

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140905

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130904

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184977 T3

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717035 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980904

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT