Global Patent Index - EP 0829916 A3

EP 0829916 A3 2000-05-03 - Microwave component

Title (en)

Microwave component

Title (de)

Mikrowellen-Bauelement

Title (fr)

Composant pour micro-ondes

Publication

EP 0829916 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97202691 A

Priority

DE 19636840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829916A2] The microwave element has a pan shaped rectangular housing Ä1Ü with several coupled wall sections Ä3-7Ü. Several internal gaps are provided for the associated conductors. A cover Ä8Ü, fabricated from a magnetic material, is provided to enclose the housing. Contained within the housing there are several stacked discs, such as ferrite discs Ä9,11Ü, an external conducting copper foil Ä12Ü, and a first pole disc Ä13Ü of a magnetically conductive material. There is also a thermal flux ring Ä14Ü, a second pole disc Ä15Ü, a permanent magnet Ä16Ü and a spring disc Ä17Ü.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/387

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/387 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19636840 A1 19980312; DE 59712740 D1 20061116; EP 0829916 A2 19980318; EP 0829916 A3 20000503; EP 0829916 B1 20061004; US 6005451 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130902

2012-12-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121108 AND 20121114

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712740

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712740 P 20061116

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040705

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG GMBH

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI SE