Global Patent Index - EP 0829920 A3

EP 0829920 A3 2000-04-26 - Method for generation of sum- and difference antenna patterns with low sidelobes for planar antenna arrays

Title (en)

Method for generation of sum- and difference antenna patterns with low sidelobes for planar antenna arrays

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Summen- und Differenz-Antennendiagrammen mit niedrigen Nebenkeulen für planare Gruppenantennen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour générer des diagrammes d'antenne de somme et différence à lobes secondaires faibles dans des réseaux d'antennes plans

Publication

EP 0829920 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115437 A

Priority

DE 19636849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829920A2] The method involves forming quotient values for the azimuth and elevation planes of several single antenna elements (I=1,2..N). The quotient di/dw is formed and quantised, in which di is a predetermined difference value and wi is an amplitude value. Sum and difference antenna diagrams are formed for the single antenna elements, with the azimuth and elevation planes having values of the quotient di/wi, which were formed and quantised. The antenna elements with the same quotient values are used to form subgroups and these form the basis of the diagrams

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26; H01Q 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 25/02 (2013.01); H01Q 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] NICKEL U R O: "Subarray configurations for digital beamforming with low sidelobes and adaptive interference suppression", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL RADAR CONFERENCE, 8 May 1995 (1995-05-08) - 11 May 1995 (1995-05-11), alexandria, VA, USA, pages 714 - 719, XP002131976
  • [A] NICKEL U: "Monopulse estimation with subarray-adaptive arrays and arbitrary sum and difference beams", IEE PROCEEDINGS - RADAR, SONAR AND NAVIGATION, vol. 143, no. 4, August 1996 (1996-08-01), London, UK, pages 232-238, XP002131977
  • [A] NICKEL U: "Monopulse estimation with adaptive arrays", IEE PROCEEDINGS F (RADAR AND SIGNAL PROCESSING), vol. 140, no. 5, October 1993 (1993-10-01), London, UK, pages 303 - 308, XP002131978

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19636849 A1 19980312; EP 0829920 A2 19980318; EP 0829920 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE