Global Patent Index - EP 0829927 B1

EP 0829927 B1 2000-05-24 - Device for connecting a bus bar to an electrical conductor

Title (en)

Device for connecting a bus bar to an electrical conductor

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verbindung einer Stromschiene mit einem elektrischen Leiter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement d'une barre de puissance à un organe de conduction électrique

Publication

EP 0829927 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401849 A

Priority

FR 9611093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0829927A1] The electrical connection unit has a holder (15) with a hole (14) on one side to input a first conductor slab connector (10) from a current rail, and a forward inner section (15) allowing input of a second connector slab. The holder is sealed with a plug, and a second connector unit (17) fixed on the holder wall has a clamping element (23) locking the two slab connectors together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 4/70 (2006.01); H01R 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 4/70 (2013.01); H01R 9/223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0829927 A1 19980318; EP 0829927 B1 20000524; DE 69702100 D1 20000629; DE 69702100 T2 20010201; ES 2147426 T3 20000901; FR 2753308 A1 19980313; FR 2753308 B1 19981127; PT 829927 E 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2011-02-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-06-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147426 T3

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702100 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991012

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971106

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE