Global Patent Index - EP 0830073 B1

EP 0830073 B1 2000-11-15 - WATERPROOF SHOE STRUCTURE WITH ADHESIVELY SECURED SOLE

Title (en)

WATERPROOF SHOE STRUCTURE WITH ADHESIVELY SECURED SOLE

Title (de)

WASSERDICHTES SCHUHWERK MIT ANGEKLEBTER LAUFSOHLE

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE CHAUSSURE IMPERMEABLE A L'EAU AVEC SEMELLE EXTERIEURE ADHESIVE

Publication

EP 0830073 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96920763 A

Priority

  • DE 19521107 A
  • DE 19608139 A
  • EP 9602361 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9641548A1] A shoe structure, comprising at least one part of a shoe, consisting of an upper having at least one outer layer (1) and a liner (2) containing a waterproof and water-vapour-permeable functional layer over the inside of the outer layer, a first insole (3) sealing off the bottom of the inside of the shoe structure, a second insole (4) and a sole (6) adhesively secured to the second insole (4), where the base of the liner (2) is longer than the outer layer (1) about a lower end region and the lower end region of the liner is folded back inwards and arranged on the second insole, and where the second insole (4) has a peripheral outer edge, the outer edge is shaped to match that of the outer layer and bonded to the lower end region of the outer layer, in which the second insole (4) is cut in such a way that it has a peripheral outer edge and a peripheral inner edge and thus forms a strip between the outer and inner edges, the lower folded end region of the liner has a first partial section (2') on which the second insole bears and a second partial section (2'') which projects inwardly beyond the inside of the second insole (4), and at least the second partial section (2'') of the downwardly folded end region of the liner (2) is waterproofly bonded to the first insole (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/12 (2006.01); A43B 9/00 (2006.01); A43B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/125 (2013.01); A43B 9/00 (2013.01); A43B 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9641548 A1 19961227; AT 197536 T 20001215; AU 6189996 A 19970109; EP 0830073 A1 19980325; EP 0830073 B1 20001115; JP H11507560 A 19990706; US 5943791 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606145

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-06-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-02-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-02-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606145 20001221

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197536 T 20001215

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991229

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971126

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE