Global Patent Index - EP 0830096 A4

EP 0830096 A4 2000-08-16 - HAIR TRANSPLANTATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

HAIR TRANSPLANTATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

System für die Implantation von Haaren

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSPLANTATION DE CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 0830096 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96920233 A

Priority

  • US 9607007 W
  • US 44492395 A
  • US 63024496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9636290A1] A system for transplanting hair grafts from a donor region of a patient's scalp to a recipient region of the patient's scalp. The system includes harvesting N (N >/= 1) strips of skin containing living hair follicles from the donor region, while cutting the strips into hair grafts simultaneously. The system also includes loading the hair grafts sequentially, bottom down, into a removable cartridge (53) connected to an instrument (65) for implanting the grafts (54, 59 and 60), the hair grafts being loaded so as to create an air seal between the hair grafts and the cartridge. The hair grafts are implanted one at a time by first feeding a hair graft to a predetermined position in the instrument, secondly making an incision in the recipient region with a cutting device (72), and thirdly sliding the hair graft into the incision.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/50; A61B 17/32; A61B 17/322; A61B 17/34; A61F 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/32 (2006.01); A61F 2/10 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/322 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/32093 (2013.01); A61F 2/10 (2013.01); A61B 17/3213 (2013.01); A61B 17/322 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00969 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9636290 A1 19961121; AU 5860596 A 19961129; EP 0830096 A1 19980325; EP 0830096 A4 20000816; IL 118234 A 20010724; IL 118234 D0 19960912; TW 377291 B 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040921

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2000-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/50 A, 7A 61B 17/34 B, 7A 61B 17/32 B, 7A 61B 17/322 B, 7A 61F 2/10 B

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT