Global Patent Index - EP 0830183 A4

EP 0830183 A4 2000-06-21 - EXERCISE APPARATUS FOR USE WITH CONVENTIONAL CHAIRS

Title (en)

EXERCISE APPARATUS FOR USE WITH CONVENTIONAL CHAIRS

Title (de)

ÜBUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM GEBRAUCH MIT HERKÖMMLICHEN STÜHLEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR FAIRE DE L'EXERCICE, ADAPTABLE A DES CHAISES DE TYPE USUEL

Publication

EP 0830183 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95920521 A

Priority

  • CA 2221105 A
  • US 9506281 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9636402A1] An exercise apparatus (14) for attachment to a conventional office chair (10) of either the swivel or multiple leg type having a plurality of resilient members (22, 22') attached to the chair with a chain (20) or other conventional mechanism and attached to a foot support bar (26) which can be pushed away from the chair by an occupant of the chair, stretching the resilient members (22, 22') and thereby exercising the occupant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/04 (2006.01); A63B 23/04 (2006.01); A63B 21/055 (2006.01); A63B 21/16 (2006.01); A63B 22/20 (2006.01); A63B 23/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/04 (2013.01); A63B 21/1609 (2015.10); A63B 23/03516 (2013.01); A63B 21/00061 (2013.01); A63B 21/00069 (2013.01); A63B 21/04 (2013.01); A63B 21/0442 (2013.01); A63B 21/0557 (2013.01); A63B 22/20 (2013.01); A63B 2071/025 (2013.01); A63B 2208/0233 (2013.01); A63B 2210/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9636402 A1 19961121; AU 2594795 A 19961129; CA 2221105 A1 19961121; CA 2221105 C 20060718; EP 0830183 A1 19980325; EP 0830183 A4 20000621; EP 0830183 B1 20031105

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69532089

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120516

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-04-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANKOVITZ, ROY J.

2004-04-07 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANKOVITZ, ROY J.

2004-02-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040216

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69532089 P 20031211

2003-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANKOVITZ, ROY, M.

2003-12-10 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANKOVITZ, ROY, M.

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-06-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT