Global Patent Index - EP 0830236 B1

EP 0830236 B1 2000-04-26 - METHOD OF REMOVING EXPLOSIVES ADHERING TO A SURFACE

Title (en)

METHOD OF REMOVING EXPLOSIVES ADHERING TO A SURFACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ABLÖSEN VON AN EINER OBERFLÄCHE HAFTENDEN EXPLOSIVSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DECOLLER DES EXPLOSIFS ADHERENTS A UNE SURFACE

Publication

EP 0830236 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96918633 A

Priority

  • DE 29509289 U
  • DE 19601814 A
  • EP 9602286 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639277A2] A method is proposed for removing explosives deposits in effluent pipes or for dissolving explosive from ammunitions casings. The explosive is removed from the wall of the pipe or casing with the aid of a gaseous jet medium to which preferably dry ice is added as an abrasive. A robot (10) is used for operations in pipes. The robot carries an air lance (26) for delivering the jet medium and a television camera (34). The air lance (26) and camera can be rotated by remote control about the pipe axis and can pivot about a transverse axis (52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 3/32; B08B 5/02; B08B 9/04; B24C 1/00; F41H 11/16; F42B 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 27/00 (2006.01); B08B 9/04 (2006.01); B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 3/32 (2006.01); E03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 9/00 (2013.01); A62C 27/00 (2013.01); B08B 9/0433 (2013.01); B08B 9/049 (2013.01); B24C 1/003 (2013.01); B24C 3/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639277 A2 19961212; WO 9639277 A3 19970130; AT 192058 T 20000515; EP 0830236 A2 19980325; EP 0830236 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070528

2006-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060509

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KIPP JENS-WERNER

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605061 20000531

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192058 T 20000515

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KIPP, JENS-WERNER

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIPP, JENS-WERNER

1999-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF REMOVING EXPLOSIVES ADHERING TO A SURFACE

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981110

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB