Global Patent Index - EP 0830375 A4

EP 0830375 A4 20011121 - HUMAN INHIBITOR OF APOPTOSIS GENE 1

Title (en)

HUMAN INHIBITOR OF APOPTOSIS GENE 1

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHER INHIBITOR DES APOPTOSEGENS 1

Title (fr)

INHIBITEUR HUMAIN DU GENE 1 DE L'APOPTOSE

Publication

EP 0830375 A4 20011121 (EN)

Application

EP 95919804 A 19950511

Priority

  • CA 2220670 A 19950511
  • US 9505922 W 19950511

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9635703A1] A human inhibitor of apoptosis polypeptide and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide and a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for the treatment of degenerative diseases, rheumatoid arthritis, septic shock, as an antiviral defense mechanism and to prevent the death of cells during trauma and strokes. Antagonists against such polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to promote cell development, kill viral infections, promote tissue differentiation and development and maintain tissue homeostasis are also disclosed (tumors). Diagnostic methods for detecting mutations in the nucleic acid sequence encoding hIAP-1 protein are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7

C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] ROTHE M ET AL: "THE TNFR2-TRAF SIGNALING COMPLEX CONTAINS TWO NOVEL PROTEINS RELATED TO BACULOVIRAL INHIBITOR OF APOPTOSIS PROTEINS", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, vol. 83, no. 7, 29 December 1995 (1995-12-29), pages 1243 - 1252, XP002032302, ISSN: 0092-8674
  • [PX] LISTON P ET AL: "SUPPRESSION OF APOPTOSIS IN MAMMALIAN CELLS BY NAIP AND A RELATED FAMILY OF IAP GENES", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, vol. 379, no. 6563, 25 January 1996 (1996-01-25), pages 349 - 353, XP002032296, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [PX] UREN A G ET AL: "CLONING AND EXPRESSION O FAPOPTOSIS INHIBITORY PROTEIN HOMOLOGS THAT FUNCTION TO INHIBIT APOPTOSIS AND/OR BIND TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR-ASSOCIATED FACTORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 93, May 1996 (1996-05-01), pages 4974 - 4978, XP000918891, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [PY] DUCKETT C S ET AL: "A CONSERVED FAMILY OF CELLULAR GENES RELATED TO THE BACULOVIRUS IAP GENE AND ENCODING APOPTOSIS INHIBITORS", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 15, no. 11, 1996, pages 2685 - 2694, XP002032297, ISSN: 0261-4189
  • [PY] RAJCAN-SEPAROVIC ET AL: "Assignment of human inhibitor of apoptosis protein (IAP) genes xiap, hiap-1, and hiap-2 to chromosomes Xq25 and 11q22-q23 by fluorescence in situ hybridization", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, vol. 37, no. 3, 1 November 1996 (1996-11-01), pages 404 - 406, XP002121939, ISSN: 0888-7543
  • [A] ROY N ET AL: "THE GENE FOR NEURONAL APOPTOSIS INHIBITORY PROTEIN IS PARTIALLY DELETED IN INDIVIDUALS WITH SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, vol. 80, no. 1, 13 January 1995 (1995-01-13), pages 167 - 178, XP002032295, ISSN: 0092-8674
  • [A] VAUX D L: "TOWARD AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE MOLECULAR MECHANISMS OF PHYSIOLOGICAL CELL DEATH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 90, February 1993 (1993-02-01), pages 786 - 789, XP000918873, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 9635703A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 9635703 A1 19961114; AU 2548095 A 19961129; CA 2220670 A1 19961114; EP 0830375 A1 19980325; EP 0830375 A4 20011121

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 9505922 W 19950511; AU 2548095 A 19950511; CA 2220670 A 19950511; EP 95919804 A 19950511