Global patent index - EP 0830398 A4

EP 0830398 A4 2000-03-01 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN OIL SORBENT POLYMER AND THE PRODUCT THEREOF

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN OIL SORBENT POLYMER AND THE PRODUCT THEREOF

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM ÖLSORBIERENDEM POLYMER UND DARAUS ERHALTENES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYMERE A SORPTION D'HUILE ET PRODUIT AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 0830398 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96918244 A

Priority

  • US 9609265 W
  • US 48610795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9640809A1] The present invention is directed to a porous terpolymer microparticle having a high oil absorbency. The method of the present invention comprises the steps of: dissolving butyl methacrylate, allyl methacrylate, and an ethylene glycol dimethacrylate in a mole ratio of about 1:3 to 5:5 to 7 respectivement, along with an effective amount of oil soluble polymerization initiator in a volatile and a substantially water immiscible organic solvent to provide a monomer mixture; adding the monomer mixture to a larger volume of an aqueous solution having an effective amount of a suspension stabilizer dissolved therein to form an organic/acqueous biphasic liquid system; vigorously stirring the biphasic liquid system at a rate sufficient to cause the water immiscible organic phase to be suspended as microdroplets in the aqueous phase; allowing polymerization to occur in the suspended microdroplets to produce a microporous terpolymer microparticle therein; and separating the microporous terpolymer microparticle from the volatile and substantially water immiscible organic solvent to produce a microporous and oil sorbent terpolymer microparticle characterized by having a mean diameter of less than 25 microns and a total sorption capacity for mineral oil that is 72 % by weight or greater. The present invention is further directed to a microporous and oil absorbent microparticle comprising a terpolymer of butyl methacrylate, allyl methacrylate and an ethylene glycol dimethacrylate in a mole ration of 1:3 to 5:5 to 7 respectively, the microparticle characterized by having a mean unit diameter of less than 25 microns and a total sorption capacity for mineral oil that is 72 % by weigh or greater.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 218/02; C08F 220/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/26 (2006.01); B01J 20/30 (2006.01); C08F 2/06 (2006.01); C08F 220/18 (2006.01); C08F 220/28 (2006.01); C08F 220/40 (2006.01); C08F 222/10 (2006.01); C09K 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/30 (2013.01); B01J 20/26 (2013.01); C08F 2/06 (2013.01); C08F 220/18 (2013.01); C08F 220/28 (2013.01); C08F 220/40 (2013.01); C08F 222/1006 (2013.01); C09K 3/32 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2998 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9640809 A1 19961219; DE 69623012 D1 20020919; DE 69623012 T2 20021212; EP 0830398 A1 19980325; EP 0830398 A4 20000301; EP 0830398 B1 20020814; ES 2181891 T3 20030301; US 5677407 A 19971014; US 5777054 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150606

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69623012

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140604

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2181891

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69623012

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011213

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971021

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL