Global Patent Index - EP 0830491 B1

EP 0830491 B1 2001-05-23 - OVERHEAD DOOR-CLOSING UNIT

Title (en)

OVERHEAD DOOR-CLOSING UNIT

Title (de)

OBENTÜRSCHLIESSER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE DE PORTE PAR LE HAUT

Publication

EP 0830491 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97914081 A

Priority

  • DE 9700122 W
  • DE 19603186 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19603186A1] The invention concerns an overhead door-closing unit in which the two opposed pistons (2, 3) usually used are replaced by a one-piece piston (1). This one-piece piston design increases the efficiency of the door-closing unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/104 (2013.01); E05F 3/227 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19603186 A1 19970731; DE 19603186 C2 19980219; AT 201477 T 20010615; EP 0830491 A1 19980325; EP 0830491 B1 20010523; ES 2113337 T1 19980501; ES 2113337 T3 20010916; WO 9728341 A1 19970807

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150125

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150124

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150125

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150124

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703586

2015-04-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG, 58256 ENNEPETAL, DE

- Document: DE 59703586

- Effective date: 20150224

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DORMA G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-02-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2113337 T3

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703586 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201477 T 20010615

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990708

1998-07-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-06-05 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-05-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-05-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2113337 T1

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980209

1998-04-01 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE