Global Patent Index - EP 0830632 B9

EP 0830632 B9 2002-12-18 - PHASE CONTRAST IMAGING

Title (en)

PHASE CONTRAST IMAGING

Title (de)

PHASENKONTRASTBILDERZEUGUNG

Title (fr)

IMAGERIE A CONTRASTE DE PHASE

Publication

EP 0830632 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 96911939 A

Priority

  • DK 9600190 W
  • DK 50695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9634307A1] The invention relates to a method and a system for synthesizing a prescribed intensity pattern based on phase contrast imaging that is not based on the assumption of prior art methods that the pahase shift phi is less than 1 radian. An improved method based on a simple imaging operation with a simple one-to-one mapping between resolution elements of a spatial phase modulator and resolution elements of the generated intensity pattern is provided. According to the invention a method is provided for synthesizing an intensity pattern with low loss of electromagnetic energy, comprising spatial modulation of electromagnetic radiation with a spatial phase mask for modulation of the phase of the incident eletromagnetic radiation by phasor values of individual resolution elements of the spatial phase mask, each phasor value being determined in such a way that the values of the Fourier transformed phasors attain predetermined values for predetermined spatial frequencies, and the phasor value of the specific resolution element of the spatial phase mask corresponds to a distinct intensity level of the image of the resolution element in the intensity pattern, and a spatial phase filter for phase shifting of a part of the electromagntic radiation, in combination with an imaging system for generation of the intensity pattern by interference in the image plane of the imaging system between the part of the electromagnetic raidation that has been phase shifted by the phase filter and the remaining part of the electromagnetic radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 27/52; G06E 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/46 (2006.01); G02B 27/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/52 (2013.01); G03H 2001/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9634307 A1 19961031; AU 5496396 A 19961118; DE 69622406 D1 20020822; DE 69622406 T2 20030313; DE 69622406 T4 20031030; EP 0830632 A1 19980325; EP 0830632 B1 20020717; EP 0830632 B9 20021218; JP 3962088 B2 20070822; JP H11504129 A 19990406; US 6011874 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69622406

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140426

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69622406

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-07-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-08-29 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69622406 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000807

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB