Global Patent Index - EP 0830825 A3

EP 0830825 A3 2000-07-05 - Linkage element for a furniture frame, assembling kit for a furniture support and construction set for assembling a piece of furniture

Title (en)

Linkage element for a furniture frame, assembling kit for a furniture support and construction set for assembling a piece of furniture

Title (de)

Koppelelement für ein Möbelgestell, Bausatz für den Zusammenbau eines Möbelständers und Baukasten für den Zusammenbau eines Möbelstücks

Title (fr)

Elément de liaison pour cadre de meuble, ensemble d'assemblage pour support de meuble et jeu de construction pour l'assemblage d'un meuble

Publication

EP 0830825 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116263 A

Priority

  • DE 19638692 A
  • DE 29701559 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0830825A2] The modular table may be used in an office. It has several side frame sections (4) which may be joined together end-to-end by short locking pieces which may fit into slots in the top surface. Side frames of any desired length may thus be built up. The side frames may be joined at intervals by cross-frames (5) which help to support rectangular table-top sections (17), legs (6) may be attached to the frame sections at intervals to support the table.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 17/00; A47B 13/02; A47B 87/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/00 (2006.01); A47B 87/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 87/002 (2013.01); A47B 17/003 (2013.01); A47B 2021/062 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0830825 A2 19980325; EP 0830825 A3 20000705; EP 0830825 B1 20030611; AT 242607 T 20030615

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-06-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710254

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WINI BUROMOBEL GEORG SCHMIDT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WINI BUEROMOEBEL GEORG SCHMIDT GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WINI BUEROMOEBEL GEORG SCHMIDT GMBH & CO. KG#AUHAGENSTRASSE 79#31863 COPPENBRUEGGE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WINI BUEROMOEBEL GEORG SCHMIDT GMBH & CO. KG#AUHAGENSTRASSE 79#31863 COPPENBRUEGGE (DE)

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710254 P 20030717

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 17/00 A, 7A 47B 87/00 B, 7A 47B 13/02 B

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT