Global patent index - EP 0830826 A3

EP 0830826 A3 2000-01-26 - A slat of laminated wood for a slatted bed-base

Title (en)

A slat of laminated wood for a slatted bed-base

Title (de)

Federleiste aus Schichtholz

Title (fr)

Latte en bois laminé pour sommier à lattes

Publication

EP 0830826 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116052 A

Priority

DE 19638582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0830826A2] The wooden spring leaf comprises a large number of thin veneers glued to each other. Over a set length, two or more veneers (4) are not joined to each other at the ends of the leaf (1). This length can be equal to between 10% and 40% of the leaf length. A separating layer (5) can be inserted between the veneers where they are not joined together. The layer can be made of paper or plastics sheet, or material applied to the veneers in the liquid state. Alternatively it can be in powder form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 21/04 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0830826 A2 19980325; EP 0830826 A3 20000126; CZ 9702942 A3 19980415; DE 19638582 A1 19980326; HU 217506 B 20000228; HU 9701544 A2 19980428; HU 9701544 A3 19980528; HU 9701544 D0 19971128; PL 184626 B1 20021129; PL 322157 A1 19980330; RO 115614 B1 20000428

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020527

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT;LV

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT

1998-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: LT;LV