Global Patent Index - EP 0830897 B1

EP 0830897 B1 2001-05-30 - Wear-resistant surface coating for rollers of high pressure roller mills for pressure milling of granular material

Title (en)

Wear-resistant surface coating for rollers of high pressure roller mills for pressure milling of granular material

Title (de)

Verschleissfeste Oberflächenpanzerung für die Walzen von Hochdruck-Walzenpressen zur Druckzerkleinerung körnigen Gutes

Title (fr)

Revêtement résistant à l'usure pour cylindres de broyeurs à cylindres à haute pression pour le broyage sous pression de matériau granulaire

Publication

EP 0830897 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112644 A

Priority

DE 19638237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0830897A1] The armour plating comprises a number of pins (11) with the mushroom configuration and which by its head (12) protrudes outwards from the roller body (10), and by its shank (13) is let into the corresponding recess or hole in the roller body. A free space (14) remains between the bottom of the hole and lower shank end. The seating face of the pin head lies flush with the roller surface or is countersunk in a recess (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/305 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 0830897 A1 19980325; EP 0830897 B1 20010530; DE 19638237 A1 19980326; DK 0830897 T3 20010806; US 5860609 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703658

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703658

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-08-22 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703658 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000908

1998-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK

1998-12-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK