Global Patent Index - EP 0831031 A3

EP 0831031 A3 2000-03-22 - Tube closure

Title (en)

Tube closure

Title (de)

Tubenverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture de tube

Publication

EP 0831031 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97112687 A

Priority

DE 29616574 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831031A2] The tube has a top with a cylindrical lower part (1). This has an outlet hole (2) and recesses (4) on its periphery. The recesses extend over a quarter of its circumference at an angle of 85 degrees -60 degrees , preferably 80 degrees -70 degrees , to the lower part's axis. A cap has projections around its periphery which fit into the recesses when put onto the lower part. Preferably the recesses are branch channels with an open end (4a) accessible in the direction of the end face and whose closed end (4b) is further from the end face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/0471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29616574 U1 19961114; EP 0831031 A2 19980325; EP 0831031 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE