Global Patent Index - EP 0831035 B1

EP 0831035 B1 2000-12-27 - Tablet dispenser

Title (en)

Tablet dispenser

Title (de)

Tablettenspender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de comprimés

Publication

EP 0831035 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115666 A

Priority

  • DE 29616221 U
  • DE 29713884 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831035A2] The tablet dispenser comprises a prismatic housing (20) whose base surface (22) has a rectangular base opening (21) set on its side surface. Its roof surface (30) has its entire cross section open, whilst above its side surface (34,35) is a recess (29). There is a prismatic supply chamber (12) with a vertically oriented tablet dispensing shaft (13) provided on the base of the chamber. The shaft is guide through base opening of the housing and a spring (14) that is supported against the base surface of the housing, as well as a mount (23) arranged to an elevation limit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/03 (2013.01); B65D 83/0409 (2013.01); B65D 2583/0481 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831035 A2 19980325; EP 0831035 A3 19980527; EP 0831035 B1 20001227; AT 198306 T 20010115; ES 2154865 T3 20010416; PT 831035 E 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154865 T3

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702804 20010201

2001-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198306 T 20010115

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990811

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980915

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

1998-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI