Global Patent Index - EP 0831174 B1

EP 0831174 B1 2002-11-06 - Process and apparatus for dewatering a fibre suspension

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for dewatering a fibre suspension

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Entwässern einer Faserstoffsuspension

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la déshydratation d'une suspension fibreuse

Publication

EP 0831174 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112834 A

Priority

DE 19635202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19648773A1] In a process for dewatering a suspension of fibrous material, the suspension is fed as a layer into the space between two convergent surfaces which move at different speeds, and the dewatering takes place on both sides of the layer. Also claimed are three arrangements in which the process can be carried out. The first includes a rotating, driven cylinder (4) whose surface is provided with openings (5) and forms the inner curved surface (2). The outer curved surface (1) is formed by a sieve (6) located around part of the periphery of the cylinder. The second includes a stationary cylinder whose surface is provided with openings and forms the inner curved surface. The outer curved surface is formed by an endless flexible sieve belt which can be moved and follows part of the periphery of the cylinder. In the third, the inner surface is formed by a curved stationary shoe, and the outer by a moving, endless, flexible sieve belt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/66; D21D 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/78 (2006.01); D21F 1/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/78 (2013.01); D21F 1/80 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5167770 A 19921201 - BUBIK ALFRED [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19648773 A1 19980305; AT 227371 T 20021115; EP 0831174 A1 19980325; EP 0831174 B1 20021106; US 6042735 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060725

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-07-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708657 20021212

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER FIBER SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227371 T 20021115

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

1998-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980925

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1998-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI