Global Patent Index - EP 0831177 A3

EP 0831177 A3 2000-01-05 - Hydrophilic dispersion polymers for paper applications

Title (en)

Hydrophilic dispersion polymers for paper applications

Title (de)

Hydrophile Dispersionspolymere für Papieranwendungen

Title (fr)

Polymères hydrophiles en dispersion pour applications papetières

Publication

EP 0831177 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97116538 A

Priority

US 71928396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0831177A2] A papermaking process comprising forming an aqueous cellulosic papermaking slurry and adding a hydrophilic dispersion polymer to the slurry to increase retention and/or drainage is disclosed. The hydrophilic dispersion polymer comprises (a) a cationic monomer and (b) a second monomer represented by (meth)acrylamide (in an aqueous solution of a polyvalent anionic salt), wherein the polymerization is carried out in the presence of either an organic high-molecular weight multivalent cation comprising a water-soluble polymer containing at least one (a) monomer and/or poly diallyl dimethyl ammonium chloride (DADMAC). After addition of the polymers, the slurry is drained to form a sheet, and the sheet is dried.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/04; D21H 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/04 (2013.01); D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/455 (2013.01); D21H 17/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0831177 A2 19980325; EP 0831177 A3 20000105; EP 0831177 B1 20070725; AU 3918297 A 19980326; BR 9704862 A 19990119; CA 2216242 A1 19980324; CA 2216242 C 20060314; DE 69737945 D1 20070906; DE 69737945 T2 20071206; ES 2290960 T3 20080216; ID 18321 A 19980326; MX 9707246 A 19980830; MY 136998 A 20081231; NO 324301 B1 20070917; NO 974381 A 19980325; NO 974381 D0 19970923

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-22 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20101022

2010-12-22 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20101022

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-06-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290960 T3

2007-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69737945 P 20070906

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2007-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 23/04 20060101AFI20061221BHEP

2007-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 21/10 20060101ALI20061221BHEP

2007-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21H 17/37 20060101ALI20061221BHEP

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE